Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 805 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4318 Week
» 24611 Month
» 202515 Year
» 1867891 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78543 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90414 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25398
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 17 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
PPRD   Pontypool Road 4w/e 10/07/1948
CDF   Cardiff Canton on 14/10/1948
PPRD   Pontypool Road 4w/e 30/10/1948
41D   Canklow w/e 29/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/10/1947
GWRALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 30/11/1947
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton on 14/10/1948
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 30/10/1948
LOAN 25A Wakefield on 21/08/1949
LOAN 41D Canklow 4w/e 05/09/1959
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. SLS/194711
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. SLS/194712
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78543
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25398
   
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
14/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90414    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90414    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston    

prev prev