Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 337 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2038 Week
» 10153 Month
» 137596 Year
» 1802972 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78546 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90416 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25401
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 19 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
24A   Accrington w/e 03/12/1949
24A   Accrington 5w/e 24/12/1949
26C   Bolton w/e 04/08/1951
26C   Bolton 4w/e 11/08/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 01/01/1955
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 25/12/1954
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78546
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25401
   
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90416    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
04/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90416    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev