Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 722 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6122 Week
» 24174 Month
» 257094 Year
» 1922470 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78550 m/e 03/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3100 m/e 04/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63100 w/e 13/11/1948
British Railways 90100 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25405
To Service During 03/1945
Withdrawal Mon 13/01/1964
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1945
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 04/09/1948
YK   York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/10/1956
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 21/09/1957
56B   Ardsley w/e 07/07/1962
     Withdrawn on 13/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 14/03/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 07/07/1962
WDN   on 13/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Stored) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78550
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25405
   
04/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3100    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63100    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90100    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
13/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90100    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev