Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 864 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4377 Week
» 24670 Month
» 202574 Year
» 1867950 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78554 m/e 03/1945
British Railways 90419 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25409
To Service During 03/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1945
26D   Bury w/e 03/12/1949
26D   Bury 5w/e 24/12/1949
9K   Bolton w/e 21/12/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 22/08/1964
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 05/09/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78554
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25409
   
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90419    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90419    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev