Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 855 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4368 Week
» 24661 Month
» 202565 Year
» 1867941 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78556 m/e 03/1945
British Railways 90420 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25411
To Service During 03/1945
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1945
24B   Rose Grove w/e 03/12/1949
24B   Rose Grove 5w/e 24/12/1949
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24A Accrington w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 03/12/1949
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78556
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25411
   
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90420    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90420    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev