Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 845 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4358 Week
» 24651 Month
» 202555 Year
» 1867931 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78559 m/e 03/1945
British Railways 90421 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25414
To Service During 03/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/08/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1945
36A   Doncaster w/e 28/09/1963
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 11/01/1964
36A   Doncaster w/e 20/06/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 01/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK MEX Mexborough on 26/03/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 04/07/1964
WDN   w/e 01/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78559
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25414
   
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90421    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
01/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90421    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev