Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 847 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4360 Week
» 24653 Month
» 202557 Year
» 1867933 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78561 m/e 09/1944
British Railways 90371 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25322
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
26F   Patricroft w/e 14/01/1961
26A   Newton Heath w/e 12/01/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK STM St Margarets on 15/04/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 09/04/1949
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   w/e 25/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78561
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25322
   
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90371    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90371    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev