Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 844 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4357 Week
» 24650 Month
» 202554 Year
» 1867930 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78562 m/e 09/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3087 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63087 w/e 04/09/1948
British Railways 90087 w/e 23/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25323
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Thu 25/10/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
40E   Langwith Junction 5w/e 23/04/1955
41H   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 19/07/1958
36C   Frodingham w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 25/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 25/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78562
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25323
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3087    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63087    
23/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90087    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
25/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90087    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev