Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 826 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2507 Week
» 22800 Month
» 200704 Year
» 1866080 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78563 m/e 09/1944
British Railways 90372 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25324
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 21/04/1956
36A   Doncaster w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78563
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25324
   
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90372    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90372    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev