Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 818 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2499 Week
» 22792 Month
» 200696 Year
» 1866072 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78565 m/e 09/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3088 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63088 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90088 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25326
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/07/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
CLK   Colwick w/e 28/08/1948
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
40B   Immingham 4w/e 19/10/1957
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 09/11/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 25/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 18/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   w/e 25/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78565
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25326
   
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3088    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63088 but not taken up    
28/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90088    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
25/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90088    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev