Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 125 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3638 Week
» 23931 Month
» 201835 Year
» 1867211 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78568 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90374 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25329
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/03/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 22/10/1949
24A   Accrington 4w/e 03/12/1955
24B   Rose Grove w/e 23/01/1960
24A   Accrington w/e 06/02/1960
24B   Rose Grove w/e 04/03/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 28/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STM St Margarets on 22/05/1947
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 09/04/1949
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 13/04/1949
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 04/03/1961
WDN   w/e 28/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/05/1947 Eastfield MPD New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78568
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25329
   
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90374    
22/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
28/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90374    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev