Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 125 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3638 Week
» 23931 Month
» 201835 Year
» 1867211 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78569 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90375 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25330
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/07/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 02/12/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 27/03/1954
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 17/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 04/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78569
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25330
   
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90375    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90375    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev