Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78569 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
British Railways |
90375 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1944 |
25D |
|
Mirfield |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
27B |
|
Aintree |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
24D |
|
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/11/1949 |
Brighton Works |
On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . |
SLS/194912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78569 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25330 |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90375 |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90375 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|