Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 824 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4337 Week
» 24630 Month
» 202534 Year
» 1867910 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78570 m/e 10/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3091 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63091 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90091 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25331
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/08/1963
50D   Goole w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78570
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25331
   
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3091    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63091 but not taken up    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90091    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
24/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90091    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev