Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 814 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4327 Week
» 24620 Month
» 202524 Year
» 1867900 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78572 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90376 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25333
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Horwich)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STM St Margarets on 24/05/1947
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 04/09/1948
EXLOAN STM St Margarets on 27/10/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78572
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25333
   
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90376    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90376    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich    

prev prev