Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 800 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4313 Week
» 24606 Month
» 202510 Year
» 1867886 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78575 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90377 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25336
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal Sun 13/02/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
51L   Thornaby w/e 03/10/1959
55D   Royston w/e 01/12/1962
55E   Normanton w/e 28/12/1963
55D   Royston 4w/e 27/03/1965
     Withdrawn on 13/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK YK York (North) on 08/04/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 27/07/1947
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 55D Royston 3w/e 24/11/1962
ALLOC 55E Normanton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 27/03/1965
WDN   on 13/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78575
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25336
   
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90377    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
01/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
13/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90377    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev