Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3624 Week
» 23917 Month
» 201821 Year
» 1867197 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78577 m/e 10/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3092 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63092 w/e 24/04/1948
British Railways 90092 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25338
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal Mon 11/10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
SKN   Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 20/08/1955
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 16/03/1963
51C   West Hartlepool w/e 29/06/1963
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 31/08/1963
50D   Goole w/e 30/11/1963
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 13/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 11/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 07/12/1945
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 02/03/1963
LOAN 66A Polmadie 4w/e 06/03/1963
EXLOAN 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 06/07/1963
EXLOAN 91NE   5w/e 13/07/1963
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   on 11/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78577
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25338
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3092    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63092    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90092    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
11/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90092    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev