Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 892 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1910 Week
» 2849 Month
» 206339 Year
» 1871715 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78578 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90378 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25339
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates m/e 12/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
53C   Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 30/06/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/10/1950
53C   Hull Springhead 5w/e 19/01/1957
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 08/02/1958
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 10/05/1958
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 06/12/1958
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 15/07/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 28/08/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead on 21/05/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1950
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 01/12/1958
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78578
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25339
   
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90378    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
24/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90378    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev