Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 788 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4301 Week
» 24594 Month
» 202498 Year
» 1867874 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78580 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90379 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25341
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal Mon 21/03/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
     Withdrawn on 21/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 03/09/1949
EXLOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   on 21/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78580
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25341
   
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90379    
21/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90379    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev