Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 53 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2979 Week
» 4717 Month
» 132160 Year
» 1797536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78597 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 90390 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25358
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/09/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 19/05/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
26A   Newton Heath 8w/e 27/06/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/10/1951
26A   Newton Heath w/e 27/10/1951
26F   Patricroft w/e 15/09/1962
26A   Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 04/01/1964
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 14/03/1964
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 19/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 8w/e 31/05/1947
LOAN HIT Hither Green 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 19/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/01/1949 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. SLS/194902
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108
20/05/1951 Locos renumbered S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 78597    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90390    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
19/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90390    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull