Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 327 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6254 Week
» 4992 Month
» 419313 Year
» 1640878 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78602 m/e 12/1944
British Railways 90395 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25363
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Fri 28/10/1966
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1944
55D Royston w/e 30/01/1960
55E Normanton w/e 28/12/1963
56A Wakefield 4w/e 09/10/1965
50A York (North) 4w/e 04/12/1965
   Withdrawn on 28/10/1966
52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 55E Normanton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 04/12/1965
WDN   on 28/10/1966
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 78602    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90395    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
28/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90395    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)