Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 758 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2439 Week
» 22732 Month
» 200636 Year
» 1866012 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78615 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90404 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25376
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal Thu 08/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
25C   Goole 4w/e 28/01/1956
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 25/02/1956
     Withdrawn on 08/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 06/08/1949
LOAN 25C Goole 4w/e 28/01/1956
EXLOAN 25A Wakefield 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 08/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78615
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25376
   
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90404    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    
08/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90404    

prev