Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 751 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 22725 Month
» 200629 Year
» 1866005 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78616 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90405 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25377
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal Sat 30/09/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
50A   York (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957
56A   Wakefield w/e 07/11/1959
51A   Darlington w/e 18/06/1960
56B   Ardsley w/e 09/12/1961
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/09/1965
55E   Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
     Withdrawn on 30/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 02/07/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 51A Darlington 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   on 30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78616
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25377
   
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90405    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
30/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90405    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev