Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 855 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4368 Week
» 24661 Month
» 202565 Year
» 1867941 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78621 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90406 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25382
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 22/07/1950
25A   Wakefield m/e 30/11/1950
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 02/12/1950
25F   Low Moor m/e 16/06/1956
51A   Darlington 5w/e 14/06/1958
51L   Thornaby w/e 03/10/1959
50D   Goole w/e 31/08/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 22/07/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Stratton Park The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. SLS/194709
09/09/1963 Thornaby MPD (in store) The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. SLS/196310
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78621
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25382
   
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90406    
22/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90406    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev