Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 816 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6216 Week
» 24268 Month
» 257188 Year
» 1922564 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8625 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 78625 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3126 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63126 w/e 02/10/1948
British Railways 90447 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2299
Works Number 5026
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Mon 18/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
CAR   Carlisle Canal w/e 27/03/1948
35C   Spital Bridge on 13/08/1950
31B   March w/e 06/02/1960
36A   Doncaster w/e 28/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 18/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAR Carlisle Canal w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge on 13/08/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   on 18/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
01/02/1960 Peterborough Midland Closure Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. SLS/196003
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8625
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5026
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78625    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3126    
27/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63126    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90447    
13/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
28/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
18/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90447    

prev prev