Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1315 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14721 Week
» 67737 Month
» 187264 Year
» 3214117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8672 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78672 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90643 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5073 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/02/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
04/09/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8672 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5073 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78672 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90643 |
|
|
18/06/1949 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90643 |
|
|
08/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J Routledge: Bootle |
|
|