Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 300 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2001 Week
» 10116 Month
» 137559 Year
» 1802935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8672 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 78672 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90643 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5073
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/02/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at J Routledge (Bootle)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
25A   Wakefield (Reinstated) (Ex store on ER) w/e 18/06/1949
27B   Aintree 4w/e 25/09/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 08/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 04/09/1954
WDN   w/e 08/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8672
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5073
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78672    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90643    
18/06/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Wakefield (25A)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
08/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90643    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by J Routledge: Bootle    

prev prev