Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 271 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1972 Week
» 10087 Month
» 137530 Year
» 1802906 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8673 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 78673 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3153 m/e 04/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63153 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90474 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5074
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 18/07/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
IMM   Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 24/10/1953
8L   Aintree w/e 25/04/1964
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 18/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 11/12/1945
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 18/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8673
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5074
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78673    
04/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3153    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63153 but not taken up    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90474    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
18/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90474    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev