Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 959 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2033 Week
» 27394 Month
» 260314 Year
» 1925690 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8691 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 78691 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3162 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63162 w/e 08/05/1948
British Railways 90483 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2300
Works Number 5092
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Mon 02/03/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
TWD   Tweedmouth w/e 12/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/07/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
91W   To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 31/08/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
84D   Leamington 4w/e 24/04/1954
84C   Banbury 4w/e 05/09/1959
41J   Langwith Junction on 02/12/1962
     Withdrawn on 02/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 12/12/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
LOAN 40B Immingham on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 84D Leamington 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   on 02/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
01/02/1964 Branch line news (Stripping Shop) Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April.
The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964.
SLS/196403
07/03/1964 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8691
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5092
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78691    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3162    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63162    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90483    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
02/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90483    

prev prev