Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3903 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17946 Week
» 82900 Month
» 285564 Year
» 3312417 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8692 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
War Dept. |
78692 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3163 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63163 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90484 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5093 |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 13/03/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/03/1962 |
Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8692 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5093 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78692 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3163 |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63163 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90484 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90484 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |
|
|