Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 466 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5453 Week
» 13568 Month
» 141011 Year
» 1806387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79199 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90669 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2307
Works Number 5142
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 11/08/1951
26F   Patricroft w/e 09/01/1960
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 19/01/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 01/02/1964
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 18/04/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/04/1964
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 17/04/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 19/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 24/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HIT Hither Green 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 01/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 24/07/1965
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 12/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
03/01/1966 Colwick MPD Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. SLS/196603

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 79199
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5142
   
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90669    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
01/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90669    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev