Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 288 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1989 Week
» 10104 Month
» 137547 Year
» 1802923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79203 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90671 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2307
Works Number 5146
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/09/1963
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
27B   Aintree w/e 28/07/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 11/08/1951
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 28/11/1953
26E   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 18/05/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 07/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   w/e 07/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Brighton Works No. 21C149 is in shops for conversion to 'B.B.' Class. Nos. S79203 and S1178 are painted in black livery; the latter has the number on the bunker, still, in spite of its diminutive size. The oil-burner S21C136 left shops on 20/2.
'Schools' S938 has now left, but 903 an 906 are in shops under repair. Metal sheeting is now being added to the lower half of the boiler of the 'West Country' class in addition to the air-smoothed casing. This is believed to be an attempt to avoid the oil-bath catching fire and damaging the asbestos clothing, etc
SLS/194804
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 79203
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5146
   
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90671    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
07/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90671    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev