Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 50 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2976 Week
» 4714 Month
» 132157 Year
» 1797533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79207 m/e 11/1944
British Railways 90675 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2307
Works Number 5150
To Service During 11/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1944
68A     w/e 25/03/1950
63A   Perth South on 24/04/1950
91X   To Scottish Region 4w/e 17/06/1950
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 03/12/1955
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 22/02/1958
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 07/02/1959
36A   Doncaster w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN FRA Fratton 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC FEL Feltham P 01/12/1947
LOAN 63A   on 19/01/1950
ALLOC 68A   w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 63A Perth South on 24/04/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 79207
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5150
   
25/03/1950 Allocation      
24/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90675    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90675    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev