Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 276 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1977 Week
» 10092 Month
» 137535 Year
» 1802911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79228 m/e 12/1944
British Railways 90689 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2308
Works Number 5171
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
24F   Fleetwood w/e 10/02/1962
9K   Bolton w/e 28/12/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 03/10/1964
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 17/04/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 19/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 24/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) m/e 31/05/1948
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall on 14/04/1949
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 01/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 24/07/1965
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 12/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1966 Colwick MPD Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. SLS/196603

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 Renumbered Renumbered to 79228    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90689    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90689    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull