Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79243 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90697 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2308
Works Number 5186
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
38E   Woodford Halse w/e 29/09/1951
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/10/1951
16A   Toton w/e 21/12/1963
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 18/04/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 25/04/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/08/1964
41D   Canklow w/e 12/09/1964
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 12/08/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse on 12/07/1953
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 16A Toton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 79243
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5186
   
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90697    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
08/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90697    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev