Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 49 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2975 Week
» 4713 Month
» 132156 Year
» 1797532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79266 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90706 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2313
Works Number 5209
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1966
Service Life 21 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
26A   Newton Heath (Reinstated) (from WR Stock) 2w/e 03/12/1949
24H   Hellifield 4w/e 12/07/1958
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 10/01/1959
21B   Bescot w/e 03/09/1960
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 10/09/1960
8L   Aintree w/e 30/05/1964
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 24H Hellifield 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 12/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. SLS/194808
03/01/1966 Colwick MPD Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. SLS/196603

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 79266
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5209
   
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90706    
03/12/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Newton Heath (26A)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hellifield (24H)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
03/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90706    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev