Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 49 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2975 Week
» 4713 Month
» 132156 Year
» 1797532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79281 m/e 03/1945
British Railways 90718 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2313
Works Number 5224
To Service During 03/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1945
6B   Mold Junction w/e 22/09/1951
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 29/12/1951
26E   Lees (Oldham) w/e 28/11/1959
9D   Newton Heath w/e 18/04/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 19/09/1964
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 17/04/1965
36A   Doncaster w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 22/09/1951
LOAN 24A Accrington w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 01/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1949 Brighton Works No. 36001, the first of the 'Leader' Class (0-6-6-0T) was outside the Works for the first time, in steam, on 21/6. The top casing was grey and the underframes and casings black. It is understood that this Class and also the new 'Battle of Britain' batch (34091 upwards) will normally be finished in lined black as for mixed traffic engines. The latest 2-8-0 repaired and re-numbered is No. 90718 (ex 79281). No. 2039 Hartland Point is in the repair shop, but its fate is uncertain: it is believed that the boiler is about worn out. Other engines recently shopped are Nos. 32488 (ex S2488), 90107 (ex 77007), 90678 (ex 79210), 32083 (plain black-so far), 90226 (ex 77311), 32536. 32576. SLS/194907
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 79281
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5224
   
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90718    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90718    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev