Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 298 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18101 Week
» 71117 Month
» 190644 Year
» 3217497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D99 |
03/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45135 |
03/09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
03/05/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
09/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/10/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
29/01/1963 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D99 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
12/1965 |
Naming |
Named '3RD CARABINIER' |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45135 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
09/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45135 |
|
|