Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4506 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20118 Week
» 118763 Month
» 321427 Year
» 3348280 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
10000 |
30/11/1947 |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1947 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 10000 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
19/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10000 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|