Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 218 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3250 Week
» 21302 Month
» 254222 Year
» 1919598 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1015 21/01/1963  

Names Carried
Name Date From
WESTERN CHAMPION 21/01/1963

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
5221/01/1963
Wheels C-C
Builder Swindon Works
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 3
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
To Service 21/01/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A)
Withdrawn 13/12/1976 off Laira (84A)
Time in Service 13 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys
Total Mileage 1,296,000 miles
Status Preserved

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt - also, at 'A' end only, yellow bands extending around the cabsides - never ran in BR service in this livery. 21/01/1963
Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt. 25/01/1963
MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 08/11/1965
BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 08/11/1968

Allocations
Code Name Date From
88A Cardiff Canton (New) on 21/01/1963
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/04/1963
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/06/1963
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 28/09/1963
84A Laira 4w/e 25/01/1964
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/01/1964
84A Laira 4w/e 22/02/1964
87E Landore 9w/e 25/01/1969
84A Laira on 05/10/1971
   Withdrawn on 13/12/1976

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
06/04/1970 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks Passenger working  
09/10/1970 Not severe   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks Passenger working  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
21/01/1963 To Service To service as British Railways Number 1015, name: WESTERN CHAMPION
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)
Livery applied: Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt - also, at 'A' end only, yellow bands extending around the cabsides - never ran in BR service in this livery.
   
25/01/1963 Livery Change of ref_livery to Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt.    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
08/11/1965 Livery Change of ref_livery to MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel    
08/11/1968 Livery Change of ref_livery to BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
13/12/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 1015 from Laira (84A)    

prev prev