Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 559 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4241 Week
» 10949 Month
» 163902 Year
» 1829278 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (Pre 1955) 10201 30/12/1950  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D16/2
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D16/2a30/12/1950
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Ashford Works
To Service 30/12/1950 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawn 07/12/1963
Time in Service 12 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys
Total Mileage 749,432 miles
Cut Up 01/1968
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Information To store unserviceable October 15th 1962
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) on 30/12/1950
73A Stewarts Lane on 20/01/1951
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1952
1B Camden on 02/04/1955
1A Willesden w/e 21/11/1959
   Stored on 15/10/1962
   Withdrawn on 07/12/1963

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
31/12/1956 D1281 Alterations to Housing Roof   £77/-/- £30/-/- £107/-/-


Works Visits
Where Repaired Date Stopped Days Since Last Stopped Works Entry Departure Class of Repair Waiting Repair Decision Waiting Works On Works Total Duration Cost of Repair Mileage Notes
Brighton Works 20/10/1952 n/a 22/01/1953 Heavy Intermediate     80 days 80 days £1,782.00  
Brighton Works 17/03/1953 54 days 24/03/1953 Light Casual   2 days 4 days 6 days £143.00  
Brighton Works 15/07/1953 113 days 31/07/1953 Light Casual
Fire damage
    14 days 14 days    
Brighton Works 05/09/1953 36 days 07/10/1953 Heavy Intermediate   1 day 26 days 27 days £1,308.00  
Brighton Works 22/02/1954 138 days 25/06/1954 Heavy Intermediate     105 days 105 days £3,670.00  
Peckham Rye 22/11/1954 150 days 01/12/1954 Non Classified     8 days 8 days    
Brighton Works 01/01/1955 31 days 10/03/1955 Heavy Casual 2 days   56 days 58 days £1,457.00  
Derby Works 10/05/1955 61 days 16/05/1955 Non Classified     5 days 5 days    
Crewe Works 01/09/1955 108 days 23/09/1955 Light Casual   1 day 18 days 19 days £434.00  
Crewe Works 27/09/1955 4 days 12/10/1955 Non Classified
Rectification
    13 days 13 days    
Derby Works 08/11/1955 27 days 10/08/1956 Heavy General 3 days 2 days 229 days 234 days £13,208.00  
Derby Works 23/10/1956 74 days 28/12/1956 Heavy Casual   11 days 44 days 55 days £1,861.00  
Derby Works 11/05/1957 134 days 20/05/1957 Light Casual   1 day 6 days 7 days £1,086.00  
Derby Works 23/05/1957 3 days 27/05/1957 Non Classified
Rectification
    3 days 3 days    
Derby Works 11/06/1957 15 days 05/07/1957 Heavy Casual   3 days 18 days 21 days £1,962.00  
Derby Works 18/09/1957 75 days 27/09/1957 Light Casual   1 day 7 days 8 days £675.00  
Derby Works 11/03/1958 165 days 14/05/1958 Heavy Casual   5 days 49 days 54 days £3,297.00  
Derby Works 06/08/1958 84 days 22/08/1958 Non Classified   4 days 10 days 14 days £681.00  
Derby Works 02/09/1958 11 days 17/09/1958 Non Classified
Rectification
  5 days 8 days 13 days    
Derby Works 06/10/1958 19 days 29/10/1958 Non Classified   6 days 14 days 20 days £171.00  
Derby Works 02/09/1959 308 days 27/11/1959 Heavy Casual     74 days 74 days £5,400.00  

Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year Annual Mileage Cumulative Mileage Fuel Oil Utilised Approximate Miles/Gallon Classified Wait Repair Classified Wait Works Classified On Works Classified Total (Wkdys) Running Repairs Running Repair & Exams Cost Wkdys Not Required for Service Wkdys Stored Serviceable Wkdys Stored Unserviceable Total Weekdays Unavailable
1950 773 773 860g 0.90           1     1
1951 2,508 3,281 2,525g 0.99         41 £289 256     297
1952 114,052 117,333 126,840g 0.90   1 74 75 51 £4,134 1     127
1953 119,433 236,766 135,732g 0.88   1 67 68 29 £3,022 9     106
1954 95,689 332,455 112,520g 0.85   1 105 106 39 £2,220 2     147
1955 42,842 375,297 47,674g 0.90 4 3 127 134 28 £2,684 20     182
1956 13,424 388,721 14,490g 0.93   11 233 244 10 £835 8     262
1957 146,370 535,091       5 34 39 41 £2,674 2     82
1958 79,791 614,882 84,013g 0.95   10 57 67 64 £2,416       131
1959 46,534 661,416 50,492g 0.92     74 74 80 £1,142 19     173
1960 46,699 708,115 55,364g 0.84         123 £1,855       123
1961 33,311 741,426             116 £839 2     118
1962 8,006 749,432                   67 67

Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/12/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 10201
Built at Ashford Works
   
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
22/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 22/01/1953.
Stopped on 20/10/1952
   
24/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 24/03/1953.
Stopped on 17/03/1953
   
31/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 31/07/1953.
Stopped on 15/07/1953
Work undertaken:
Fire damage
   
07/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 07/10/1953.
Stopped on 05/09/1953
   
01/11/1953 Works Visit Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Dep: 01/11/1953.
Stopped on 30/10/1953
   
25/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 25/06/1954.
Stopped on 22/02/1954
   
01/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Peckham Rye (Non Classified) - Dep: 01/12/1954.
Stopped on 22/11/1954
   
10/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 10/03/1955.
Stopped on 01/01/1955
   
02/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
16/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 16/05/1955.
Stopped on 10/05/1955
   
23/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 23/09/1955.
Stopped on 01/09/1955
   
12/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 12/10/1955.
Stopped on 27/09/1955
Work undertaken:
Rectification
   
10/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Dep: 10/08/1956.
Stopped on 08/11/1955
   
28/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 28/12/1956.
Stopped on 23/10/1956
   
31/12/1956 Modification Modification: Alterations to Housing Roof    
20/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 20/05/1957.
Stopped on 11/05/1957
   
27/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 27/05/1957.
Stopped on 23/05/1957
Work undertaken:
Rectification
   
05/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 05/07/1957.
Stopped on 11/06/1957
   
27/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 27/09/1957.
Stopped on 18/09/1957
   
14/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 14/05/1958.
Stopped on 11/03/1958
   
22/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 22/08/1958.
Stopped on 06/08/1958
   
17/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 17/09/1958.
Stopped on 02/09/1958
Work undertaken:
Rectification
   
29/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 29/10/1958.
Stopped on 06/10/1958
   
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
27/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 27/11/1959.
Stopped on 02/09/1959
   
15/10/1962 To Store To Store    
07/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 10201    
01/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev