|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brighton Works | 10/03/1952 | n/a | 27/03/1952 | Light Casual | 15 days | 15 days | £163.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 20/05/1952 | 54 days | 11/07/1952 | Light Intermediate | 1 day | 44 days | 45 days | £845.00 | ||||
Brighton Works | 16/09/1952 | 67 days | 17/10/1952 | Light Casual | 27 days | 27 days | £321.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 26/01/1953 | 101 days | 26/03/1953 | Heavy Intermediate | 51 days | 51 days | £2,772.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 08/06/1953 | 74 days | 17/08/1953 | Heavy Casual | 60 days | 60 days | £3,201.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 06/01/1954 | 142 days | 19/01/1954 | Light Casual | 1 day | 10 days | 11 days | £227.00 | ||||
Brighton Works | 09/03/1954 | 49 days | 02/04/1954 | Heavy Casual | 2 days | 19 days | 21 days | £691.00 | ||||
Brighton Works | 29/04/1954 | 27 days | 03/05/1954 | Light Casual | 3 days | 3 days | £88.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 05/06/1954 | 33 days | 19/07/1954 | Heavy Casual | 2 days | 35 days | 37 days | £962.00 | ||||
Brighton Works | 16/10/1954 | 89 days | 30/03/1955 | Heavy Intermediate | 2 days | 2 days | 135 days | 139 days | £5,034.00 | |||
Derby Works | 02/09/1955 | 156 days | 09/11/1955 | Light Casual | 1 day | 10 days | 47 days | 58 days | £1,988.00 | |||
Derby Works | 28/12/1955 | 49 days | 03/01/1956 | Non Classified | 5 days | 5 days | ||||||
Derby Works | 30/01/1956 | 27 days | 16/11/1956 | Heavy General | 2 days | 349 days | 351 days | £13,332.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 10/07/1957 | 236 days | 16/07/1957 | Non Classified | 1 day | 4 days | 5 days | |||||
Derby Works | 09/09/1957 | 55 days | 18/10/1957 | Heavy Casual | 1 day | 33 days | 34 days | £2,656.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 19/04/1958 | 183 days | 16/05/1958 | Light Casual | 2 days | 21 days | 23 days | £724.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 06/08/1958 | 82 days | 22/08/1958 | Light Casual | 4 days | 10 days | 14 days | £819.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 02/09/1958 | 11 days | 17/09/1958 | Non Classified Rectification |
5 days | 8 days | 13 days | |||||
Derby Works | 06/10/1958 | 19 days | 24/11/1958 | Heavy Casual | 6 days | 36 days | 42 days | £2,910.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 06/03/1959 | 102 days | 26/06/1959 | Non Classified | 3 days | 92 days | 95 days | £1,673.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 10/03/1960 | 258 days | 08/07/1960 | Heavy Casual | 21 days | 81 days | 102 days | £6,800.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 15/02/1961 | 222 days | 29/04/1961 | Light Casual | 2 days | 60 days | 62 days | £2,116.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 13/07/1961 | 75 days | 04/08/1961 | Non Classified | 5 days | 2 days | 12 days | 19 days | £371.00 | |||
Derby Works | 28/08/1961 | 24 days | 29/12/1961 | Light Casual | 1 day | 103 days | 104 days | £2,497.00 |
Year | Annual Mileage | Cumulative Mileage | Fuel Oil Utilised | Approximate Miles/Gallon | Classified Wait Repair | Classified Wait Works | Classified On Works | Classified Total (Wkdys) | Running Repairs | Running Repair & Exams Cost | Wkdys Not Required for Service | Wkdys Stored Serviceable | Wkdys Stored Unserviceable | Total Weekdays Unavailable |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1951 | 41,517 | 41,517 | 50,410g | 0.82 | £587 | 4 | 4 | |||||||
1952 | 120,571 | 162,088 | 142,190g | 0.85 | 1 | 86 | 87 | 32 | £3,424 | 119 | ||||
1953 | 72,245 | 234,333 | 94,807g | 0.76 | 2 | 128 | 130 | 33 | £2,160 | 3 | 166 | |||
1954 | 84,847 | 319,180 | 99,044g | 0.86 | 2 | 10 | 131 | 143 | 16 | £2,510 | 3 | 162 | ||
1955 | 45,197 | 364,377 | 52,680g | 0.86 | 1 | 10 | 121 | 132 | 46 | £3,047 | 4 | 182 | ||
1956 | 6,805 | 371,182 | 61,720g | 0.11 | 2 | 247 | 249 | 24 | £895 | 5 | 278 | |||
1957 | 149,122 | 520,304 | 1 | 33 | 34 | 43 | £2,740 | 1 | 78 | |||||
1958 | 86,262 | 606,566 | 84,740g | 1.02 | 17 | 75 | 92 | 26 | £1,913 | 118 | ||||
1959 | 41,351 | 647,917 | 42,192g | 0.98 | 0 | 184 | £1,212 | 11 | 195 | |||||
1960 | 32,946 | 680,863 | 45,423g | 0.73 | 21 | 81 | 102 | 48 | £1,294 | 150 | ||||
1961 | 13,877 | 694,740 | 5 | 180 | 185 | 12 | £348 | 29 | 226 | |||||
1962 | 33,907 | 728,647 | 44 | 44 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/09/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways number 10202 Built at Ashford Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
||
19/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
27/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 27/03/1952. Stopped on 10/03/1952 |
||
11/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Intermediate) - Dep: 11/07/1952. Stopped on 20/05/1952 |
||
17/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 17/10/1952. Stopped on 16/09/1952 |
||
26/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 26/03/1953. Stopped on 26/01/1953 |
||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Selhurst (Non Classified) - Dep: 09/04/1953. Stopped on 01/04/1953 |
||
17/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 17/08/1953. Stopped on 08/06/1953 |
||
08/09/1953 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Stewarts Lane (Light Casual) - Dep: 08/09/1953. Stopped on 29/08/1953 |
||
17/10/1953 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Stewarts Lane (Light Casual) - Dep: 17/10/1953. Stopped on 06/10/1953 |
||
18/12/1953 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Dep: 18/12/1953. Stopped on 15/12/1953 |
||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 19/01/1954. Stopped on 06/01/1954 |
||
02/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 02/04/1954. Stopped on 09/03/1954 |
||
09/04/1954 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Dep: 09/04/1954. Stopped on 05/04/1954 |
||
03/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 03/05/1954. Stopped on 29/04/1954 |
||
19/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 19/07/1954. Stopped on 05/06/1954 |
||
06/10/1954 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Dep: 06/10/1954. Stopped on 03/10/1954 |
||
30/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 30/03/1955. Stopped on 16/10/1954 |
||
23/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
09/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 09/11/1955. Stopped on 02/09/1955 |
||
03/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 03/01/1956. Stopped on 28/12/1955 |
||
16/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Dep: 16/11/1956. Stopped on 30/01/1956 |
||
02/12/1956 | Modification | Modification: Alterations to Housing Roof | ||
16/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 16/07/1957. Stopped on 10/07/1957 |
||
18/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 18/10/1957. Stopped on 09/09/1957 |
||
16/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 16/05/1958. Stopped on 19/04/1958 |
||
22/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 22/08/1958. Stopped on 06/08/1958 |
||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 17/09/1958. Stopped on 02/09/1958 Work undertaken: Rectification |
||
24/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 24/11/1958. Stopped on 06/10/1958 |
||
26/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 26/06/1959. Stopped on 06/03/1959 |
||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
08/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 08/07/1960. Stopped on 10/03/1960 |
||
29/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 29/04/1961. Stopped on 15/02/1961 |
||
04/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 04/08/1961. Stopped on 13/07/1961 |
||
29/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 29/12/1961. Stopped on 28/08/1961 |
||
11/11/1962 | To Store | To Store ( at Derby Works) | ||
07/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 10202 | ||
05/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |