Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 849 Week
» 17800 Month
» 170753 Year
» 1836129 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11001 01/02/1950  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built BULL1
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
01/02/1950
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3410
To Service 01/02/1950 to Norwood Junction (75C)
Withdrawn 08/08/1959
Time in Service 9 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 31/12/1959
Cut At Locomotive Works (Ashford, Kent)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
75C Norwood Junction (New) on 01/02/1950
70B Feltham (on loan) m/e 09/1950
20B Stourton (on loan) m/e 07/1952
34B Hornsey 3w/e 16/06/1956
75C Norwood Junction 9w/e 27/10/1956
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1959


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
01/02/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 11001
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C)
   
09/1950 Allocation Loaned to Feltham (70B)    
07/1952 Allocation Loaned to Stourton (20B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
08/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 11001    
31/12/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Ashford, Kent