Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1890 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15296 Week
» 68312 Month
» 187839 Year
» 3214692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7090 |
20/01/1940 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12013 |
29/10/1949 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/01/1940 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1940 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7090 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12013 |
|
|
13/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12013 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|