Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1412 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19215 Week
» 72231 Month
» 191758 Year
» 3218611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7118 |
29/04/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12031 |
29/01/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,822.00 |
To Service |
29/04/1942 |
Withdrawn |
30/12/1967 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
07/1968 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7118 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
18/07/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12031 |
|
|
30/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12031 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|