Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14001 Week
» 67017 Month
» 186544 Year
» 3213397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7120 |
14/05/1945 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12033 |
10/07/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£11,425.00 |
To Service |
14/05/1945 |
Withdrawn |
25/01/1969 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1970 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/05/1945 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1945 |
To Service |
|
|
|
26/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12033 |
|
|
30/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
11/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12033 |
|
|
05/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|