Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 943 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18746 Week
» 71762 Month
» 191289 Year
» 3218142 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7121 |
05/06/1945 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12034 |
25/12/1948 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1945 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1945 |
To Service |
|
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12034 |
|
|
16/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12034 |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|