Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20066 Week
» 73082 Month
» 192609 Year
» 3219462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7126 |
15/08/1947 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12039 |
25/01/1952 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£10,260.00 |
To Service |
15/08/1947 to Saltley (21A) |
Withdrawn |
19/10/1968 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1970 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1947 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1947 |
To Service |
|
|
|
25/01/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12039 |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12039 |
|
|
01/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|