Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 320 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18123 Week
» 71139 Month
» 190666 Year
» 3217519 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12045 |
28/04/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£10,260.00 |
To Service |
28/04/1948 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
25/01/1969 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1969 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/04/1948 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/04/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12045 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
18/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Coventry (2D) |
|
|
10/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12045 |
|
|
11/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|