Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 401 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18204 Week
» 71220 Month
» 190747 Year
» 3217600 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12063 |
12/12/1949 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1949 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12063 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
07/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12063 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
11/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Nantgarw Coking Plant |
|
|